Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crane, Willis Frank, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Vs) (Cvpt) case against Leach, Tina, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2020 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Vs) (Cvpt) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions31 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time31 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder Abuse Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Court | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder Abuse Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Elder Abuse Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.