Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof / Affidavit of Publication | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.