Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Evangeline Gaston, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Diego Aviles, against C & J Clark Retail, Inc., represented by Donald P. Sullivan, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Kira L. Klatchko presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges multiple claims against the defendant, C & J Clark Retail, Inc., and other unnamed defendants. The plaintiff, Evangeline D. Gaston, alleges the following claims: disability discrimination, failure to reasonably accommodate, fai...
Certificate of Mailing
Date: December 04, 2023Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: December 04, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: November 08, 2023Complaint for Disability Discrimination
Date: May 02, 2023Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: November 08, 2023Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-08-22T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of EVANGELINE GASTON
Date: 2023-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-08-22T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: 2023-07-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000) of EVANGELINE GASTON
Date: 2023-08-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Wrongful Termination (Over $25,000)
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.