Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
David Arturo Dorado, Jerrah Marie Kompelien, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Quill & Arrow, Llp, against Nissan North America, Inc., represented by Michael P. Sweeney, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Carol A. Greene presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: November 20, 2023Trial Setting Order
Date: October 31, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Readiness Conference
Date: April 05, 2024Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: April 08, 2024Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: October 30, 2023Complaint: Violation of Song-Beverly Act - Breach of Express Warranty
Date: January 05, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Section 170.6 CCP)
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.