Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
D7 Roofing Services, Inc., National Community Renaissance Of California, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mark S. Himmelstein, against D7 Roofing Services, Inc., Does 1 Through 25, Inclusive, represented by Jose Leonel Parra, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Manuel Bustamante, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint for: Negligence; Breach of Contract; Breach of Express Warranty
Date: October 31, 20221st Amended Cross-Complaint of D7 ROOFING SERVICES, INC.
Date: June 20, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: June 20, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration pursuant to Dept PS2 Rules
Date: 2023-04-27T00:00:00Defendant D7 Roofing Services, Inc's Cross-Complaint
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00Declaration of Jose Parra in Support of Demurrer
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Summons- Cross-Complaint
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.