Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jose Diaz, Leo Diaz, Lizzandro Diaz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by David L. Lynch, against Daniel Kim, Edward Sapigao, Kismet Organic Cultivation, Inc., A California Corporation, Kismet Organic Growers, Llc, A Suspended California Limited Liablility Company, Kismet Organic Holdings, Llc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Kira L. Klatchko presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by plaintiffs Leo Diaz, Jose Diaz, and Lizzandro Diaz against defendants Kismet Organic Holdings, LLC and Kismet Organic Cultivation, Inc. The plaintiffs allege a breach of contract by the defendants. Accordin...
Certificate of Mailing
Date: December 08, 2023Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a default judgment pursuant to CRC 3.110(h)
Date: December 08, 2023Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: December 08, 2023Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: November 07, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: November 07, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: August 29, 2023Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2023-07-11T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: August 03, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: August 03, 20231st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of LEO DIAZ
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: July 25, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.