Goodfriend Properties, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company,
filed a(n)
Quiet Title -
Property
case
represented by
Paul Bojic,
against
Michael Paradise,
in the jurisdiction of Riverside County.
This case was filed in
Riverside County
Superior Courts
Superior with Manuel Bustamante, Jr. presiding.
Case Details for
Goodfriend Properties, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company v. Michael Paradise
Case Events for
Goodfriend Properties, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company v. Michael Paradise
Date
Type
Description
March 20, 2023
Docket Event
Certificate of Mailing
March 09, 2023
Docket Event
Minute Order: Hearing re: Default Prove Up as to MICHAEL PARADISE
March 09, 2023
Docket Event
Minute Order: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to
February 14, 2023
Docket Event
Minute Order: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to
January 23, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Document Return.
January 10, 2023
Docket Event
Case Management Statement on Complaint for Quiet Title of GOODFRIEND PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
October 31, 2022
Docket Event
Case Management Statement on Complaint for Quiet Title of GOODFRIEND PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
August 18, 2022
Docket Event
Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110) Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Quiet Title of GOODFRIEND PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
August 17, 2022
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Quiet Title of GOODFRIEND PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
July 25, 2022
Docket Event
Proof of Service on Complaint for Quiet Title of GOODFRIEND PROPERTIES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY