Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Christian Brothers Mechanical Services, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael Kerbs, against Dempsey Construction Inc., A California Corporation, represented by Shailendra U. Kulkarni, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Kira L. Klatchko presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: March 28, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: October 25, 2022Notice of Document Return.
Date: September 13, 2022Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to comply with Local Rule 3218
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Document Return.
Date: October 06, 2022Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Conference Declaration
Date: September 26, 2022Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.