Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Delia Aguilera Gazca, Maribel Aguilera, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Formica Law Group, Kellian Summers, against Laurence Eugene Smith, represented by Charmaine Jackson, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Manuel Bustamante, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Auto |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Dismissal
Date: January 11, 2024PLAINTIFFS WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES
Date: September 14, 2023Notice of Court Ruling (eFiling)
Date: September 08, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DELIA AGUILERA GAZCA
Date: 2023-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel
Date: 2023-07-25T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DELIA AGUILERA GAZCA
Date: 2023-07-25T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DELIA AGUILERA GAZCA
Date: 2023-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to comply with Local Rule 3401 and PS2 Trial Rules
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Joint Declaration of Counsel Regarding Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DELIA AGUILERA GAZCA
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration pursuant to Dept PS2 Rules
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DELIA AGUILERA GAZCA
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DELIA AGUILERA GAZCA
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DELIA AGUILERA GAZCA
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DELIA AGUILERA GAZCA
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DELIA AGUILERA GAZCA
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DELIA AGUILERA GAZCA
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Complaint for Damages
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.