Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aaron Rivera Parra, Maria De Jesus Marquez Contreras, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Knight Law Group, Llp, against General Motors Llc, represented by The Erskine Law Group, Pc., in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with James T. Latting presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: January 14, 2022Notice OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: September 07, 2021Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause For Failure to Appear
Date: December 15, 2021Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: December 15, 2021Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: September 08, 2021Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.