Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nancy Labuda, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Landrum Law Firm, Llp, against Advanced Pain Management, Inc., Conformis, Conformis, Inc., Raj Kamal Sinha, M.D., Roland D. Reinhart, M.D., (total of 7) See All represented by Bowman And Brooke Llp, Ian Schuler, Jennifer A. Lowis, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp, Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, Llp, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts Superior with Lawrence W. Fry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Second Declaration of
Date: 2023-10-13T00:00:00Declaration of DAVID PUDWILL
Date: 2023-10-04T00:00:00Declaration of Terrance Wong
Date: 2023-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2023-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file Trial Setting Declaration pursuant to Dept PS2 Rules
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Declaration of JENNIFER LOWIS RE: FILING OF ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Answer pursuant to 4/7/2022 Courts Order
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Court Ruling (eFiling)
Date: November 20, 2023Notice of Document Quality Assurance
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing and Verified Application of Emily M Plunkett for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 21, 2023Second Declaration of Terrance Wong
Date: 2023-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear at Case Management Conference set on 01/06/22
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Order Granting Application of Jennifer L Bullard for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Proposed Order (hearing) re: PRO HAC VICE for hearing on 01/24/2022
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Joint Trial Setting Conference Declaration
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service Summons on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Declaration of Jennifer Lowis in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2023-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to comply with Local Rule 3401 and PS2 Trial Rules
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Courtesy Copy of Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:001st Amended Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Answer to Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Notice of hearing and Verified Application of Jennifer L. Bullard for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement on Complaint for Medical Malpractice (Over $25,000) of NANCY LABUDA
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.