Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nancy Davis, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by John David Gallegos, against Costco Wholesale Corporation, represented by Tyson & Mendes, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with James T. Latting presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of ANSWER
Date: August 27, 2021Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: September 14, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees.
Date: September 10, 2021Notice of Document Return.
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration of John D. Gallegos re OSC and Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of continuance of case management conference
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: August 27, 2021Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: August 27, 2021Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.