Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Candido Radilla Rios, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by In Pro Per, against Penn Phillips Lands Inc., in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Lawrence W. Fry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 20, 2021Judgment of Dismissal by Court; Honorable Lawrence W Fry
Date: October 29, 2021Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: September 01, 2021Minute Order: Case Management Conference
Date: July 20, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: September 01, 2021Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Case Management
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel.
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Department Assignment
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.