Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts Superior with Baker, Stephen H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBaker, Stephen H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
Category45: Unlimited Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | HORST ET AL VS. PYLE ET AL Case Number: CVPO19-0191913 This matter is on calendar for review regarding trial setting, the previous trial date having been vacated by the Court’s order dated January 26,... | |
February 14, 2024 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
January 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion/Other Predisposition Hearing
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Baker, Stephen H |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Documents Received | |
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Documents Received | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record | |
November 17, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | HORST ET AL VS. PYLE ET AL Case Number: CVPO19-0191913 This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of stay. On September 18, 2023, the Court informed the parties of its intent to lift the s... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.