Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Doersch, Ann Marie, Doersch, George R, Rodriquez, Audrey-Rose, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Evans, Timothy J, against John L Guth A Professional Organization, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2007 |
Category(07) Unlimited Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time124 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice Transfer Out Case | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion - Change Venue
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion - Change of Venue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.