Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fitzgerald, Miesha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Goldsmith, William I, against Castillo, Vanessa, represented by Harris, Mark R, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Posted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.