Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marquez, Justine Shawano, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sheffer, Craig C, against Mosqueda, Griselda, Endicott, Joshua Adam, represented by Kroesch, Douglas A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2017 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial559 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time559 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.