Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nix, Nick, Nix, Roycealynn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sager, Laurence J, against Spence, Corey, Spence, Robyn Michelle, represented by Mckenna, J Justin, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2008 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time441 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Long Cause
Judge: Jury, Trial |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Conference, Settlement |
|
September 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Long Cause | |
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.