Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Austin, Martha R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Penney & Associates, against Austin, Harry G, represented by Cameron Cobden, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2007 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time180 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.