Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2023 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2024 |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | CONSERVATORSHIP OF DORIS HERBST Case Number: CVPG23-0032280 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Appointment of a Temporary conservator of the person. Petitioner has filed an ex pa... | |
January 04, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | CONSERVATORSHIP OF DORIS HERBST Case Number: CVPG23-0032280 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Appointment of a Temporary conservator of the person. Petitioner has filed an ex pa... | |
January 03, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | CONSERVATORSHIP OF DORIS HERBST Case Number: CVPG23-0032280 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Appointment of a Temporary conservator of the person. Petitioner has filed an ex pa... | |
January 02, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | CONSERVATORSHIP OF DORIS HERBST Case Number: CVPG23-0032280 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Appointment of a Temporary conservator of the person. Petitioner has filed an ex pa... | |
January 01, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | CONSERVATORSHIP OF DORIS HERBST Case Number: CVPG23-0032280 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Appointment of a Temporary conservator of the person. Petitioner has filed an ex pa... | |
December 30, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | CONSERVATORSHIP OF DORIS HERBST Case Number: CVPG23-0032280 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Appointment of a Temporary conservator of the person. Petitioner has filed an ex pa... | |
December 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | CONSERVATORSHIP OF DORIS HERBST Case Number: CVPG23-0032280 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Appointment of a Temporary conservator of the person. Petitioner has filed an ex pa... | |
December 27, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | CONSERVATORSHIP OF DORIS HERBST Case Number: CVPG23-0032280 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Appointment of a Temporary conservator of the person. Petitioner has filed an ex pa... | |
December 26, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | CONSERVATORSHIP OF DORIS HERBST Case Number: CVPG23-0032280 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Appointment of a Temporary conservator of the person. Petitioner has filed an ex pa... | |
December 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | CONSERVATORSHIP OF DORIS HERBST Case Number: CVPG23-0032280 This matter is on calendar for hearing on a Petition for Appointment of a Temporary conservator of the person. Petitioner has filed an ex pa... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.