Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts with Bigelow, Molly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBigelow, Molly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Hearing |
Further Proceedings
Judge: Bigelow, Molly |
|
May 14, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF ZAYDA NORMAN Case Number: CVPG21-0031379 This matter is on calendar for further proceedings regarding status of guardianship in Washington. At the prior hearing on February 6, 2023, th... | |
April 24, 2023 | Hearing |
Annual Status Review
Judge: Bigelow, Molly |
|
February 24, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF ZAYDA NORMAN Case Number: CVPG21-0031379 22. 1:30 PM CVPG21-0031379 GUARDIANSHIP OF NORMAN JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: REGARDING STATUS ... | |
February 23, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF ZAYDA NORMAN Case Number: CVPG21-0031379 22. 1:30 PM CVPG21-0031379 GUARDIANSHIP OF NORMAN JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: REGARDING STATUS ... | |
February 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF ZAYDA NORMAN Case Number: CVPG21-0031379 22. 1:30 PM CVPG21-0031379 GUARDIANSHIP OF NORMAN JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: REGARDING STATUS ... | |
February 21, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF ZAYDA NORMAN Case Number: CVPG21-0031379 22. 1:30 PM CVPG21-0031379 GUARDIANSHIP OF NORMAN JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: REGARDING STATUS ... | |
February 20, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF ZAYDA NORMAN Case Number: CVPG21-0031379 22. 1:30 PM CVPG21-0031379 GUARDIANSHIP OF NORMAN JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: REGARDING STATUS ... | |
February 19, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF ZAYDA NORMAN Case Number: CVPG21-0031379 22. 1:30 PM CVPG21-0031379 GUARDIANSHIP OF NORMAN JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: REGARDING STATUS ... | |
February 18, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF ZAYDA NORMAN Case Number: CVPG21-0031379 22. 1:30 PM CVPG21-0031379 GUARDIANSHIP OF NORMAN JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: REGARDING STATUS ... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.