Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diaz, Charles, Diaz, Misty, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions150 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time150 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Investigators Report | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment/Order | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Reschedule - COVID 19 | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Referral to Sherry Scott | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Document Lodged | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.