Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stafford, Robin filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2007 |
CategoryGuardianship - Estate |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions41 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Dec & Ord Reimbursement Conservator/Guardian Investigation | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Investigators Report | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Referral to Evelyn Murphy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.