Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams, William Keith filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Michael A. Jacques presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 16, 2003 |
CategoryGuardianship - Estate |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions41 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time405 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Review Hearing
Judge: Mathews, Thomas F |
|
October 04, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 04, 2004 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
October 04, 2004 | Docket Event | Court Investigators Report | |
October 04, 2004 | Docket Event | Supervision Termination - Order Termination Guardianship | |
October 04, 2004 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 26, 2004 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Investigator | |
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Probate | |
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event | Petition Filed | |
July 26, 2004 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.