Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Crawford, Dorothea Rae filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (Prpb) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time201 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Account / Report Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | PR Petition Final Discharge | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.