Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Graffunder, Lynn, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2017 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (Prpb) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time580 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Returning Documents | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Order | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Returning Documents | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Account / Report Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Probate | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition for Account & Report | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | PR Waiver of Accounting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.