Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kahn, Michael, against Harman, Michael P, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2023 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 -Assignee |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Limited SC by Assignee | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.