Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sierra Central Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Smith, Kelly, against Cooksey, Judy, Cooksey, William, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2023 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.