Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Onemain Financial Group, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Rasa, Jansher, against Burns, Brandi L, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2023 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Limited $10K to $25K | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration/Affidavit of Non Service | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.