Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Encompass Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gaba Jr, Rudy, against Kumar, Ravi, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 04, 2015 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions221 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time817 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Partially Electronic File as of this date | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Not Satisfied | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment by Clerk | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion - $60 Fee | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | ReOpened |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.