Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collect Access Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zee Law Group, against Mcallister, Jennifer A, Mcallister, Mathew K, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions123 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time123 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Return on Attachment/Execution | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Not Satisfied | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Determining Claim of Exemption | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Claim of Exemption | |
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption | |
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.