Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fulton Friedman & Gullace, against Botello Jr, Baldo, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2008 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions280 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time280 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part | |
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.