Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Placer County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Grensavitch, Timothy W, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 1999 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Gov - Notice of Motion | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Purged | |
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued - Civil | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Ordered | |
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Tickler |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.