Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yuba, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Sykes, Christopher Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return on Bench Warrant Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Warrant Returned/Filed | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar/Commitment Form | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Ordered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.