Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yuba, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Shanyne Martin, Rabekkah Meghan, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time117 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Entry of Judgment/ Proof by Mail | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Governmental - Declaration for Default/Uncontested Judgment | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Governmental - Request to Enter Default Judgment | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Governmental - Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.