Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Smith, Robert C, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2014 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time65 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | File at Annex | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | File Returned From... | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation | |
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.