Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Molina, Rosanna A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2008 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions147 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time147 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re Contempt
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal & Proof of Service | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissal in Part | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings and Order RE Contempt | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re Contempt
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Clerk Minutes | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.