Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County Superior Court, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Kinney, Brian P, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2007 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Registration CA Support (Outgoing) | |
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Entry of Judgment/ Proof by Mail | |
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Review Hearing Family Law | |
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | FL Settlement Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.