Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Santa Barbara County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Diaz, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time4441 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Registration CA Support (Outgoing) | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.