Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sacramento Superior Court, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Jones, Patrick D, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2002 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal & Proof of Service | |
August 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part | |
August 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
August 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Application and Order | |
October 27, 2005 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.