Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Margason, Tyler S, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Boland, Mindy Nichole, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management47 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2013 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions100 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time100 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Default by Court | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.