Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Drawver, Brent Lee, Ii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Drawver, Chelsea Leann, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Declaration/Memorandum | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Declaration/Memorandum | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipt for Exhibits | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial CT Family Law
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Long Cause Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial CT Family Law
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.