Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rueda, Maria Alondra, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rueda, Oscar Ignacio, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time206 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Order - No Fee | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.