Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Smith, Kenneth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Smith, Julia, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time281 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.