Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Madaan, Sonia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Singh, Satinder, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Wirtschafter, Benjamin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time81 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Order - No Fee | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.