Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Parks, Stefanie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Parks, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time72 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return on Bench Warrant Hearing
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return on Bench Warrant Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | O/R Filed | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant Returned/Filed | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.