Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miller, Donald, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miller, Amanda, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management41 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time1504 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.