Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hiscock, Judith M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hiscock Ii, Sherrick S, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 11, 2007 |
CategoryLegal Separation W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions86 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time86 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration RE Service Dec of Disclosure Petitioners I&E | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.