Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Muir, Lois, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bordsen, Eleanor, against Muir, D Merle, represented by Bordsen, Eleanor, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 12, 1953 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions99 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time99 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Evans, Timothy J |
|
August 11, 2005 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
August 11, 2005 | Docket Event | Family Law RFO/Motion/OSC $60 | |
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Unspecified |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.