Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Chandler, Benjamin P, against Aboudkhil, Ahmed, Benbrahim, Aicha, Benbrahim Dental Corporation, Gyo Seo, Chang, represented by Shaverdian, Artin N, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2023 |
Category(14) Unlimited Eminent Domain/Inv Cond |
Last RefreshedOctober 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Confidential Information | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.